THE ROYAL SCOTTISH ACADEMY JOHN KINROSS BEQUEST (ACADEMICIANS' WIDOWS' PENSION AUGMENTATION) FUND

Charity number: 252857
Removed charity
Governing document
TRUST DEED DATED 15TH JANUARY 1954, RESOLUTION OF 5TH JULY 195J, DEEDS OF APPOINTMENT DATED 20TH DECEMBER 1965 AND 14TH FEBRUARY 196M AND SCHEME OF THE 5TH APRIL 1967
Charitable objects
1. NOT LESS THAN ONE TENTH PART OF INCOME FOR THE ASSISTANCE AND RELIEF OF WIDOWS IN NECESSITOUS CIRCUMSTANCES OF DECEASED ACADEMICIANS OF THE ROYAL SCOTTISH ACADEMY 2. BALANCE OF INCOME FOR THE ASSISTANCE AND RELIEF OF NECESSITOUS MEMBERS OF THE ACADEMY AND THEIR WIDOWS AND DEPENDANTS IN NECESSITOUS CIRCUMSTANCES.
Organisation type
No information available
Registration history
  • 15 June 1967 : registered
  • 14 April 2005 : removed (REGISTERED IN ERROR)
Other names
  • THE ROYAL SCOTTISH ACADEMY (Working name)
What the charity did
  • Education/training
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
Who the charity helped
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
How the charity helped
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Provides Other Finance