THE MILLER CENTRE TRUST

Charity number: 258420
Removed charity
Governing document
TRUST DEED DATED 28TH MARCH 1969 AND SUPPLEMENTAL DEED DATED THE 14TH FEBRUARY 1973 AS AMENDED ON 05 MAR 2018
Charitable objects
RELIEF OF OLD AGE AND OF THE AGED, (FOR DETAILS SEE CLAUSES 3 AND 4 OF TRUST DEED DATED 28TH MARCH 1969 AND CLAUSE 4 (24) OF SUPPLEMENTAL DEED).
Organisation type
Trust
Registration history
  • 19 May 1969 : registered
  • 16 November 2020 : removed (AMALGAMATED)
Other names
  • THE PARK HILL TRUST (Previous name)
What the charity did
  • General Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helped
  • Elderly/old People
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
How the charity helped
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space