HERTS AND ESSEX (WARE) SAMARITANS

Charity number: 1173717-1
Linked charity
Governing document
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 21 OCT 1969 AS AMENDED ON 16 MAY 2006 AS AMENDED ON 14 MAY 2009 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 28 JAN 2016
Charitable objects
TO WORK FOR THE ASSISTANCE OF PERSONS WHO ARE SUICIDAL, DESPAIRING OR IN DISTRESS BY PROVIDING A SERVICE PRIMARILY INTENDED FOR THE BENEFIT OF PERSONS IN EAST HERTFORDSHIRE AND WEST ESSEX AND THE SURROUNDING AREA (BUT WITHOUT SPECIFIC LIMITATIONS TO AREA) TO ENABLE SUCH PERSONS TO RECEIVE IMMEDIATE HELP, COMPASSION AND BEFRIENDING FROM MEMBERS OF THE CHARITY SELECTED AND PREPARED FOR THE PURPOSE WORKING UNDER DIRECTION; AND ALSO WHERE APPROPRIATE, IN ACCORDANCE WITH SAMARITAN PROCEDURE, REFERRAL TO PERSONS HAVING SPECIALIST SKILLS OR EXPERIENCE, AND TO SUPPORT THE COMPANY AND AID IN THE ESTABLISHMENT AND SUPPORT OF PROBATIONARY BRANCHES AND THE SUPPORT OF RECOGNISED BRANCHES OF SAMARITANS
Area of benefit
EAST HERTS WEST ESSEX AND THE SURROUNDING AREA
Registration history
  • 31 October 1969 : registered
Other names
  • HERTS/ESSEX BORDER SAMARITANS (Previous name)
This charity is a linked charity of