Accounts and annual returns THE AGATHA CHRISTIE TRUST FOR CHILDREN

Charity number: 260295
Charity reporting is up to date (30 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2021 07 March 2022 30 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 07 March 2022 30 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2020 17 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 17 December 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2019 18 February 2020 13 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 18 February 2020 13 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2018 26 November 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2018 26 November 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2017 08 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2017 Not Required