Trustees QUATERNARY RESEARCH ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 262124
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

14 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Prof Simon George Lewis Chair 08 January 2020
None on record
Dr Michael Dempster Trustee 07 January 2022
None on record
Dr Adrian Paul Palmer Trustee 01 January 2022
None on record
Dr William John Fletcher Trustee 01 January 2022
None on record
Dr Catherine Ann Delaney Trustee 01 January 2022
None on record
Professor David Howard Roberts Trustee 01 January 2022
None on record
Prof Emrys Phillips Trustee 01 January 2021
None on record
Dr James Matthew Lea Trustee 01 January 2021
None on record
Dr Robert Storrar Trustee 01 January 2021
None on record
Dr Rupert Andrew Housley Trustee 08 January 2020
None on record
Dr Christopher Darvill Trustee 01 January 2020
None on record
Prof Christopher Neil Roberts Trustee 01 January 2020
None on record
Dr Sarah Alice Woodroffe Trustee 01 January 2020
None on record
Prof Kirsty Elizabeth Helena Penkman Trustee 01 January 2020
None on record