SOLENT SKY LTD

Charity number: 262995
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
31/05/2016 31/05/2017 31/05/2018 31/05/2019 31/05/2020
Total gross income £110.11k £170.92k £175.78k £137.65k £235.10k
Total expenditure £145.75k £163.40k £163.56k £158.05k £182.51k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A