PHYLLIS TUCKWELL MEMORIAL HOSPICE LTD

Charity number: 264501
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £9.90m £10.27m £10.83m £12.00m £13.08m
Total expenditure £9.62m £10.39m £11.02m £11.83m £11.84m
Income from government contracts £1.30m £1.40m £1.58m £136.99k N/A
Income from government grants £735.53k £750.00k £750.73k £2.61m £5.26m
Income - Donations and legacies £2.29m £2.17m £2.52m £6.07m £3.24m
Income - Other trading activities £4.61m £5.04m £5.08m £2.53m £4.21m
Income - Charitable activities £2.67m £2.70m £2.84m £2.97m £5.31m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £333.73k £351.17k £389.90k £425.10k £317.32k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £1.64m £1.49m £1.85m £2.44m £1.53m
Expenditure - Charitable activities £6.62m £7.28m £7.77m £8.43m £8.77m
Expenditure - Raising funds £3.00m £3.11m £3.25m £3.40m £3.07m
Expenditure - Governance £27.36k £18.04k £26.39k £24.30k £22.65k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £333.73k £49.33k £50.67k £52.28k £55.37k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0