Trustees ASHTEAD CHORAL SOCIETY
Charity number: 265400
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Vincent Alexander Desmond | Chair | 27 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lucy Olivia Morrell | Trustee | 27 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Andrew John Moss | Trustee | 27 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Helen Parkin | Trustee | 07 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Susan Early | Trustee | 07 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Kathryn Lewis | Trustee | 25 November 2019 |
|
|||||
Cheryl Mary Greenwood | Trustee | 25 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Anne Bailey | Trustee | 11 December 2017 |
|
|
||||
Anthony James Williams | Trustee | 18 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
LINDA CROOK | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CLAIRE PRICE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ISHBEL KENWARD | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.