Accounts and annual returns PUTNEY RELIEF COMMITTEE

Charity number: 265483
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2021 07 February 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2020 09 February 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2019 12 November 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2018 02 November 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2017 03 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2017 Not Required