Accounts and annual returns WHITTLESEY RECREATION GROUND

Charity number: 266961
Charity reporting is overdue by 1333 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 Overdue Overdue by 237 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Overdue Overdue by 237 days
Annual return 31 March 2020 Overdue Overdue by 602 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Overdue Overdue by 602 days
Annual return 31 March 2019 Overdue Overdue by 968 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Overdue Overdue by 968 days
Annual return 31 March 2018 Overdue Overdue by 1333 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Overdue Overdue by 1333 days
Annual return 31 March 2017 22 February 2018 22 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required