BRIDPORT AND WEST DORSET SPORTS TRUST LIMITED

Charity number: 267781
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £1.37m £1.44m £1.46m £1.48m £1.42m
Total expenditure £1.41m £1.46m £1.59m £1.47m £1.48m
Income from government contracts £174.85k £176.25k £176.25k £179.77k £179.77k
Income from government grants £4.00k £4.00k £4.00k £4.00k £6.39k
Income - Donations and legacies £19.00k £26.85k £27.09k £44.12k £22.52k
Income - Other trading activities £83.87k £85.03k £88.54k £72.89k £78.51k
Income - Charitable activities £1.26m £1.33m £1.34m £1.36m £1.32m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £80 £75 £35 £109 £212
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.35m £1.39m £1.53m £1.40m £1.42m
Expenditure - Raising funds £58.87k £66.08k £62.77k £62.55k £61.08k
Expenditure - Governance £4.99k £5.93k £5.62k £5.83k £6.13k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0