Trustees THE GUIDE ASSOCIATION OXFORDSHIRE COUNTY
Charity number: 269199
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mrs S Cheetham | Chair | 03 September 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Carrie Francombe | Trustee | 13 April 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Lisa Cook | Trustee | 10 October 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Helen Brockis | Trustee | 13 September 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Jane Digby | Trustee | 07 September 2022 |
|
|||||||
Katy Fifield | Trustee | 15 June 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Dr Caroline Thurston | Trustee | 15 June 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Wendy Suzanne Bayliss | Trustee | 30 November 2020 |
|
|||||||
Denise Parrott | Trustee | 30 November 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Helen Hayes | Trustee | 24 June 2019 |
|
|
||||||
Sarah Macaulay | Trustee | 04 March 2019 |
|
|
||||||
Anne Lynn | Trustee | 04 March 2019 |
|
|
||||||
Miss M Grime | Trustee | 12 May 2018 |
|
|
||||||
Mrs A Bain | Trustee | 08 September 2017 |
|
|
||||||
Mr P Hyne | Trustee | 01 September 2016 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.