Trustees NORTHAMPTONSHIRE COUNTY SCOUT COUNCIL
Charity number: 269735
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
18 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Anna Marie Swann | Chair | 29 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Steven Paul Rolt | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Thomas Peter Althorpe | Trustee | 11 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Michael Billingham | Trustee | 08 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Alison Janette Andrews | Trustee | 08 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Geoffrey Barden | Trustee | 08 October 2022 |
|
|||||
Rebecca Chloe Andrews | Trustee | 08 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lucy Olivia Jewell | Trustee | 10 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Christine Paula Francis | Trustee | 25 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Samantha Jane Longhurst | Trustee | 01 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Scott Thomas Tyrrell | Trustee | 28 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
David John McInally | Trustee | 29 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Michael Raymond O'Connor | Trustee | 29 September 2018 |
|
|||||
Gillian Frances Dowling | Trustee | 29 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Glyn Timmins | Trustee | 29 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Henny Cameron | Trustee | 08 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
Karen Winfred Tonks | Trustee | 08 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
TONY FILSAK | Trustee | 10 September 2015 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.