HENDON AND DISTRICT ARCHAEOLOGICAL SOCIETY

Charity number: 269949
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 13 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 07 November 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 08 November 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 26 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 26 January 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 10 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 10 November 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 30 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not Required