Dogfen lywodraethu WORLD HABITAT
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES FO ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 9TH MARCH 1976 AS AMENDED BY A SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 5TH SEPTEMBER 2001 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 06 SEP 2017 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 20 SEP 2017 as amended on 23 Sep 2017
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO PROMOTE ENCOURAGE AND ENABLE THE PROVISION OF SAFE AND SECURE HOUSING ACROSS THE WORLD FOR PEOPLE WHO ARE IN NEED BY REASON OF POVERTY, SOCIAL ECONOMIC OR OTHER NECESSITOUS CIRCUMSTANCES, THEREBY HELPING PREVENT OR RELIEVE POVERTY; IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: (I) UNDERTAKING STUDY AND RESEARCH INTO THE SCIENCE OF THE DEVELOPMENT CONSTRUCTION MANAGEMENT OR ECONOMICS OF RESIDENTIAL HOUSING; AND (II) PUBLISHING THE USEFUL RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.