10th Teddington Scout Group
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Scouting activities for boys and girls in Teddington (Richmond on Thames)
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2022
People
6 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Richmond Upon Thames
Governance
- 11 June 1976: Standard registration
- 10th Teddington Scout Group (Working name)
- 3RD TEDDINGTON (CHRIST CHURCH) SCOUT GROUP (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sarah Pepperell | Chair | 25 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Claire Schueler | Trustee | 17 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Gillian Annette | Trustee | 26 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Estella Weston | Trustee | 25 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Charlie Grantham | Trustee | 25 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
JOHN DORAN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.26k | £8.83k | £4.09k | £8.82k | £17.94k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.56k | £7.63k | £6.39k | £8.42k | £23.40k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 03 July 2023 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 13 June 2022 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 24 November 2021 | 24 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 23 June 2020 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2018 | 03 February 2020 | 95 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2018 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
ROYAL CHARTER OF 4TH JANUARY 1912
Charitable objects
THE INSTRUCTION OF BOYS OF ALL CLASSES IN THE PRINCIPLES OF DISCIPLINE, LOYALTY AND GOOD CITIZENSHIP.
Area of benefit
LONDON BOROUGH OF RICHMOND UPON THAMES
Contact information
- Address:
-
13 Teddington Park Road
TEDDINGTON
Middlesex
TW11 8NB
- Phone:
- 07713654747
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window