Financial history DELAPAGE LIMITED

Charity number: 276017
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £7.13m £7.86m £13.22m £15.36m £6.69m
Total expenditure £3.92m £6.77m £10.07m £11.17m £12.01m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £6.84m £7.34m £13.22m £15.10m £6.48m
Income - Other £294.74k £527.86k £0 £263.40k £204.10k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £181.11k £5.89m £7.97m £8.02m £9.10m
Expenditure - Raising funds £1.89m £579.19k £2.05m £3.14m £2.91m
Expenditure - Governance £181.11k £146.75k £206.01k £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £5.74m £7.77m £8.02m £9.10m
Expenditure - Investment management £1.89m £579.19k £2.05m £2.63m £2.52m
Expenditure - Other £1.85m £297.60k £54.51k £0 £0