Accounts and annual returns THE DOMINICA (UK) ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 276254
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2021 24 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2020 15 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2019 17 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2018 21 May 2019 82 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2017 26 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2017 Not Required