Trustees THE DOMINICA (UK) ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 276254
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
VINCENT JOHN Chair 03 April 2013
NEWHAM AFRICAN CARIBBEAN CENTRE
Received: 2 days late
Ingrid Grant Trustee 24 November 2018
DOMINICA NATIONAL DEVELOPMENT AND DISASTER FUND
Received: On time
jACQUI mODESTE Trustee 24 November 2018
None on record
Jaurice Peter Trustee 24 November 2018
None on record
Sharon Azille Trustee 20 April 2017
DOMINICA NATIONAL DEVELOPMENT AND DISASTER FUND
Received: On time
Ruth Jeremy Trustee 20 April 2017
None on record
JANICE GERMAINE Trustee 01 June 2013
None on record
REGINALD JOHNSON Trustee 31 May 2013
None on record