Dogfen lywodraethu GINGERBREAD CORNER
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 31 MAY 1979 AMENDED BY RESOLUTIONS DATED 1 MARCH 1991 AND 12 NOVEMBER 1992 AND 30 JULY 2008 as amended on 21 Dec 2018
Gwrthrychau elusennol
The objects of the Charity are, for the public benefit, to: a) improve the social and economic circumstances of disadvantaged families; b) preserve, protect and improve the good health (mental, emotional and physical) of children and their parents; and c) prevent and relieve the suffering of children who have been the subject of cruelty and maltreatment.
Maes buddion
IN PRACTICE LONDON BOROUGH OF CROYDON
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.