Accounts and annual returns SHEERWATER SENIOR CITIZENS' CLUB

Charity number: 278620
Charity reporting is overdue by 1628 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 28 February 2023 Overdue Overdue by 167 days
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2023 Overdue Overdue by 167 days
Annual return 28 February 2022 Overdue Overdue by 532 days
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2022 Overdue Overdue by 532 days
Annual return 28 February 2021 Overdue Overdue by 897 days
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2021 Overdue Overdue by 897 days
Annual return 29 February 2020 Overdue Overdue by 1261 days
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2020 Overdue Overdue by 1261 days
Annual return 28 February 2019 Overdue Overdue by 1628 days
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2019 Overdue Overdue by 1628 days