Accounts and annual returns THE NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF CITIZENS ADVICE BUREAUX

Charity number: 279057
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 24 November 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 24 November 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 07 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 07 December 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 27 November 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 27 November 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2018 26 November 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 26 November 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2017 22 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 22 November 2017 On time Download Open in new window