8TH WORTHING SEA SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 279339
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 05 July 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 05 July 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 07 November 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 07 November 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 29 September 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 29 September 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 14 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 14 October 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 14 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 14 September 2017 On time Download