Trustees 8TH WORTHING SEA SCOUT GROUP
Charity number: 279339
Charity reporting is overdue by 48 days
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Nigel Rippon | Chair | 15 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
James Kennedy | Trustee | 15 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Alec Irving | Trustee | 15 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Holmes | Trustee | 15 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Harry Rippon | Trustee | 30 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Robert Tennent | Trustee | 20 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Mark Mears | Trustee | 27 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Samantha Fullman | Trustee | 06 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Kevin Lawrence | Trustee | 21 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Paul Chaplain | Trustee | 01 February 1996 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.