Trustees DDRC HEALTHCARE

Charity number: 279652
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rosemary Lunn Trustee 25 May 2022
None on record
Richard Chubb Trustee 02 May 2022
None on record
Rhodri Davey Trustee 02 May 2022
None on record
PETER ATKEY Trustee 26 January 2022
None on record
Simon Mann Trustee 26 January 2022
None on record
John Montgomerie Chapman Trustee 29 January 2020
None on record
THOMAS GAVIN ANTHONY Trustee 16 May 2016
THE BRITISH SUB AQUA JUBILEE TRUST
Received: On time
Raymond Sparrow Trustee 16 May 2016
None on record
Brian Clargo Trustee 16 May 2016
None on record
Keith Walker Trustee 16 May 2016
None on record