Trustees BEXLEY VOLUNTARY SERVICE COUNCIL LIMITED
Charity number: 279880
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Nigel Adams | Chair | 17 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Yeukai Taruvinga | Trustee | 24 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sue Quirk | Trustee | 21 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Amma Manso | Trustee | 21 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Lisa Hancock | Trustee | 27 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sophie Leedham | Trustee | 27 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Tania Bushell | Trustee | 20 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
CLAIR JOHNSON | Trustee | 09 July 2014 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.