Trustees THE ARTS SOCIETY CHICHESTER
Charity number: 280506
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Pamela Ann Cook | Trustee | 10 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Gillian Walsh | Trustee | 10 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Peter James Stewart Nicol | Trustee | 11 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Colin Cook Mr | Trustee | 11 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Judith Davenport | Trustee | 12 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Marian Carter | Trustee | 02 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
DAVID WILLIAM BASKERVILLE | Trustee | 01 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Peter Charles Chapman - Andrews | Trustee | 01 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
ANNE ANDREE GORBAN | Trustee | 09 October 2018 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.