Governing document SREE NARAYANA GURU MISSION OF THE UK
Charity number: 281388
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 19/10/1980 AS AMENDED ON 03/05/1981 AS AMENDED ON 02/05/1982 AS AMENDED ON 22/06/2008 AS AMENDED ON 14/11/2009 AS AMENDED ON 03/05/2010 AS AMENDED ON 09/04/2011 AS AMENDED ON 22/07/2012 AS AMENDED ON 05/04/2014
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE SREE NARAYANA DHARMA (THE PROMOTION OF RELIGIOUS AND RACIAL HARMONY, EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY)
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
NOT DEFINED
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.