THE FRIENDS OF ST MARY'S PERIVALE

Charity number: 281982
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2021 28 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 28 October 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2020 29 March 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 29 March 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2019 30 March 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 30 March 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2018 02 May 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2018 02 May 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2017 15 March 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2017 15 March 2018 On time Download