Financial history THE LONDON WILDLIFE TRUST

Charity number: 283895
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £3.43m £3.55m £4.78m £4.60m £4.29m
Total expenditure £3.29m £3.42m £3.69m £3.80m £3.97m
Income from government contracts £364.00k £230.85k £234.78k £355.94k £391.37k
Income from government grants £158.00k £926.35k £1.36m £199.21k £1.39m
Income - Donations and legacies £1.78m £858.00k £883.47k £1.08m £1.01m
Income - Other trading activities £321.00k £389.00k £543.06k £247.08k £591.45k
Income - Charitable activities £1.73m £2.28m £3.33m £2.89m £2.54m
Income - Endowments £397.00k £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £13.00k £18.60k £17.83k £17.99k
Income - Other £0 £11.00k £6.61k £361.78k £125.79k
Income - Legacies £40.00k £21.51k £5.01k £1.86k £39.48k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £2.52m £2.50m £2.54m £2.70m £2.46m
Expenditure - Raising funds £772.00k £923.00k £612.96k £665.26k £901.77k
Expenditure - Governance £160.00k £139.00k £155.13k £129.88k £153.05k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £535.14k £428.24k £608.94k