JAMIAT-UL-MUSLEMEEN QUWAT-UL-ISLAM MASJED
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
1. To provide facilities for the daily, Friday and festival prayers 2. The establishment of an Islamic Centre 3. The provision of facilities for the practice of the Islamic faith 4. The facilitation of communal activities 5. The provision and facilitation of Islamic education
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2022
People
12 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- West Sussex
Governance
- 12 May 1979: Standard registration
- CRAWLEY MOSQUE (Working name)
- JAMIAT-UL-MUSLIMEEN AND QUWAT-UL-ISLAM MASJID (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Arif Syed | Chair | 07 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
Shafiq Ahmed | Trustee | 10 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Asad Masood Satti | Trustee | 10 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Mohammed Fazal Badurdeen | Trustee | 10 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Zafar Satti | Trustee | 07 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
Zulfiqar Ahmed | Trustee | 07 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
Ansar Ali | Trustee | 07 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
Mohammed Abu Saleh | Trustee | 07 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
Sajjad Anwar | Trustee | 07 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
Abid Sayyad | Trustee | 07 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
MOHAMMED MUNIR KHAN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MOHAMMED UBAID KHAN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2018 | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £232.63k | £249.57k | £249.91k | £315.01k | £282.14k | |
|
Total expenditure | £208.49k | £222.23k | £204.54k | £254.31k | £254.62k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £8.14k | £13.98k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 13 July 2023 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 13 July 2023 | On time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 30 July 2022 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 30 July 2022 | On time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 31 July 2021 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 31 July 2021 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 30 July 2020 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 30 July 2020 | On time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2018 | 18 July 2019 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2018 | 18 July 2019 | On time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION AND RULES ADOPTED 12TH FEBRUARY 1982 AS AMENDED 27TH SEPTEMBER 1999, 14TH NOVEMBER 1999 AND 28TH JUNE 2005.
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE RELIGION OF ISLAM.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Crawley Mosque
Broadwood Rise
Broadfield
CRAWLEY
RH11 9SE
- Phone:
- 01293 553070
- Email:
- info@crawleymosque.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window