Financial history THE CHARLOTTE HEBER-PERCY CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 284387
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2017 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020 05/04/2021
Total gross income £289.76k £304.08k £333.14k £294.97k £263.86k
Total expenditure £345.60k £347.59k £324.33k £282.65k £314.13k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A