Trustees CLEEVE CHORALE

Charity number: 284752
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Derek Ernest Taylor Chair 13 September 2018
None on record
Claudia Sternberg Trustee 08 October 2019
None on record
Zoe Powell Trustee 23 July 2018
None on record
Catherine Louise Newbury Trustee 11 October 2016
None on record
Deirdre Dee Trustee 11 October 2016
None on record
Philip Henry Aplin Trustee 29 September 2015
THE OLD CHAPEL COMMUNITY PROJECT
Overdue by 82 days