Financial history THE APOSTOLIC CHURCH

Charity number: 284789
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £6.01m £6.38m £6.20m £5.41m £5.54m
Total expenditure £5.13m £5.31m £5.50m £4.40m £4.89m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £25.00k £40.00k N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £4.15m £4.85m £5.71m £3.93m £4.88m
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £385.45k £0
Income - Charitable activities £1.16m £945.35k £170.06k £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £282.26k £315.33k £310.84k £184.87k £257.81k
Income - Other £421.62k £270.46k £1.44k £906.45k £401.78k
Income - Legacies £35.30k £623.40k £342.74k £56.94k £105.06k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £5.13m £5.31m £4.88m £4.14m £4.50m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £194.09k £221.22k £178.50k £210.10k £208.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £613.47k £259.33k £390.33k