Accounts and annual returns WINCHESTER DRAMATIC SOCIETY

Charity number: 285043
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 07 December 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 07 December 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 03 March 2021 31 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 03 March 2021 31 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 19 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 19 December 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2018 15 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 15 January 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2017 18 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 18 December 2017 On time Download Open in new window