LONDON BACH SOCIETY

Charity number: 286878
Removed charity
Governing document
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 21ST MARCH 1983 AS AMENDED 18 APRIL 1988 AND 19 JUNE 1997
Charitable objects
TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN THE ART AND SCIENCE OF MUSIC, BY THE PRESENTATION OF CONCERTS WHICH WILL INCLUDE THE CHORAL AND ORCHESTRAL MUSIC OF J S BACH IN PARTICULAR.
Organisation type
No information available
Registration history
  • 14 April 1983 : registered
  • 07 January 2002 : removed (FUNDS TRANSFERRED (INCOR))
Other names
  • LONDON BACH SOCIETY (Working name)
  • LONDON BACH SOCIETY AND STEINITZ BACH PLAYERS (Previous name)
What the charity did
    No information available
Who the charity helped
    No information available
How the charity helped
    No information available