Riverside Trust

Charity number: 287848
Charity reporting is up to date (3 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £702.05k £1.29m £765.08k £243.01k £957.79k
Total expenditure £1.61m £2.59m £1.68m £1.01m £2.91m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £14.15k N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £50.51k £102.63k £14.19k N/A £331.95k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 N/A £0
Income - Charitable activities £589.00k £1.16m £742.31k N/A £623.09k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 N/A £0
Income - Investment £2.54k £28.00k £5.58k N/A £2.75k
Income - Other £60.00k £0 £3.00k N/A £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 N/A £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.08m £2.01m £1.09m N/A £1.36m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 N/A £193.62k
Expenditure - Governance £20.21k £20.16k £13.62k N/A £520.01k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 N/A £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 N/A £0
Expenditure - Other £529.41k £580.95k £582.80k N/A £1.36m