THE FRIENDS OF ST JAMES' THE GREAT, THORLEY

Charity number: 288678
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
WILLIAM FRANK NEWELL HARDY Trustee None on record
Daniel Paul Daniells-Smith Trustee 08 March 2019 None on record
Rev Gareth Paul Tracey Trustee 02 July 2021
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST JAMES THE GREAT THORLEY Received: On time
Graham Philip Rundle Trustee 13 January 2014 None on record
CLIVE JOHN WEIR BA, BSC Trustee 07 July 2016
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST JAMES THE GREAT THORLEY Received: On time
LINA RUTH LOADMAN Trustee None on record
Desmond Oliver Conridge Trustee 16 October 2013 None on record
SUSAN ANN RUSSELL Trustee None on record
Dr PHILIP JOHN HARGRAVE Chair
THE INCORPORATED BISHOP'S STORTFORD COLLEGE ASSOCIATION Received: On time
MARGARET MARY MORLEY Trustee None on record
Clive Colin Hayball Trustee 25 September 2017
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST JAMES THE GREAT THORLEY Received: On time