NORTHAMPTONSHIRE AND BUCKINGHAMSHIRE DYSLEXIA ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 289930
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 27 December 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 14 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 09 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 18 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 07 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required