Register of Charities - The Charity Commission THURSTON MEMORIAL PRIZE
Charity number: 525868-5
Removed charity
Governing document
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 10 NOV 1920
AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 20 SEP 1977
AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 10 NOV 1982
Charitable objects
AN ANNUAL PRIZE OF BOOK OR BOOKS OF VALUE Ú2.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Registration history
- 23 August 1966: Standard registration
- 16 December 2020: Removed (Amalgamated)
- 16 December 2020: Funds transferred to 525868 LYMM GRAMMAR SCHOOL
Other names
No other names
This charity is a linked charity of
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.