Dogfen lywodraethu BIRMINGHAM OPERA COMPANY
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 24TH SEPTEMBER 1984 AND AMENDED 24TH JANUARY 1985 AND 29TH APRIL 1987 AND 1 OCTOBER 2001 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 14 SEP 2016 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 22 JUL 2012
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO ENCOURAGE AND PROMOTE THE ADVANCEMENT OF LEARNING AND IN PARTICULAR THE ART AND SCIENCE OF MUSIC BY THE PRODUCTION ARRANGEMENT, PROMOTION AND COMMISSIONING OF OPERA AND OTHER MUSICAL PERFORMANCES AND CONCERTS AND TO FOSTER INTEREST IN SUCH OPERAS CONCERTS AND MUSICAL PERFORMANCES BY SUCH MEANS AS MAY FROM TIME TO TIME BE CONSIDERED APPROPRIATE BY THE COMPANY.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.