NARBOROUGH AND NARFORD COMMUNITY CENTRE

Charity number: 292588
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2020 01 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 01 January 2021 On time Download
Annual return 30 September 2019 29 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 Overdue Overdue by 488 days
Annual return 30 September 2018 29 January 2020 183 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2017 26 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2017 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2016 26 October 2017 88 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2016 Not Required