BARNES AND MORTLAKE HISTORY SOCIETY

Charity number: 292918
Charity reporting is up to date
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 20 November 2020 20 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 25 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 12 July 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 14 August 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2015 12 July 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 Not Required
Submit annual return

( Charity users only)