Accounts and annual returns ST MARY STAR OF THE SEA PARENT-TEACHER ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 293744
Charity reporting is overdue by 726 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2022 Overdue Overdue by 361 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Overdue Overdue by 361 days
Annual return 31 August 2021 Overdue Overdue by 726 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Overdue Overdue by 726 days
Annual return 31 August 2020 14 December 2021 167 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 09 April 2021 283 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2018 22 January 2020 206 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Not Required