Governance MOTOR NEURONE DISEASE ASSOCIATION
Charity number: 294354

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Registration history:
- 14 May 1986: Standard registration
- 14 September 2020: Funds received from 1071380 JR AND SA BROOKS CHARITABLE TRUST
- 13 May 2022: Funds received from 1025388 ROTARY CLUB OF RICKMANSWORTH TRUST FUND
- 24 June 2022: Funds received from 1106188 SOUTH MONTGOMERYSHIRE VOLUNTEER BUREAU LIMITED
- 09 August 2022: Funds received from 1058958 F.A.B.L.E (FOR A BETTER LIFE WITH EPILEPSY)
- 23 August 2022: Funds received from 271235 MARK ARMITAGE CHARITABLE TRUST
- 08 August 2023: Funds received from 1030670 INNER WHEEL CLUB OF CLIFTON BENEVOLENT FUND
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
- MND ASSOCIATION (Working name)
- MNDA (Working name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
- Care Quality Commission
Policies:
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.