THE PIOUS SOCIETY OF THE DAUGHTERS OF ST PAUL

Charity number: 296042
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 26 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 29 September 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 28 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 29 July 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 14 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 23 July 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 21 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 21 September 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2015 16 September 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 16 September 2016 On time Download