Trustees AGE UK LEWISHAM AND SOUTHWARK

Charity number: 296862
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
JOHN VENESS Chair 21 January 2013
None on record
Dr Nicky Ryan Trustee 19 November 2019
None on record
Connor Mark Lambourne Trustee 30 November 2017
None on record
Ray Boyce Trustee 26 February 2015
None on record
IRENE PAYNE Trustee 27 November 2014
None on record
MARCIA PURNELL Trustee 21 January 2013
None on record
MINY JANSEN Trustee
None on record
LEON KREITZMAN Trustee
None on record
JOHN STEWART HODGETT Trustee
None on record