VICTIM SUPPORT

Charity number: 298028
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 21 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 21 January 2022 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 08 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 08 October 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 19 September 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 19 September 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 11 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 11 September 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 31 August 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 31 August 2017 On time Download