VICTIM SUPPORT

Charity number: 298028
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £36.41m £37.18m £36.74m £37.62m £41.04m
Total expenditure £42.86m £41.12m £36.25m £37.81m £40.18m
Income from government contracts £18.68m £36.32m £25.59m £25.01m £28.24m
Income from government grants £16.81m £0 £8.72m £9.70m £9.40m
Income - Donations and legacies £364.00k £230.00k £589.00k £232.00k £116.00k
Income - Other trading activities £320.00k £516.00k £427.00k £440.00k £529.00k
Income - Charitable activities £35.49m £36.32m £35.37m £36.84m £39.77m
Income - Endowments £137.00k £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £185.00k £70.00k £26.00k £23.00k £5.00k
Income - Other £54.00k £46.00k £336.00k £85.00k £612.00k
Income - Legacies £227.00k £120.00k £511.00k £178.00k £39.00k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £42.27m £40.28m £36.05m £37.63m £40.00m
Expenditure - Raising funds £588.00k £838.00k £206.00k £184.00k £178.00k
Expenditure - Governance £698.00k £286.00k £59.00k £41.00k £28.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0