Accounts and annual returns 14TH IPSWICH (ST AUGUSTINE'S) SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 298097
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2023 27 December 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 24 January 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 31 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 29 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 31 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required